IL HJR0045 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to propose a Constitutional Amendment to permit Congress and the states to prohibit desecration of the United States flag.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FLAG DESECRATION AMENDMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 004-001-002
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback