IL HJR0043 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government and limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2019-11-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-05-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2019-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2019-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2019-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2019-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2019-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback