IL HJR0034 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages Congress to introduce and pass new legislation on the admission of Puerto Rico as the 51st State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUERTO RICO STATEHOOD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-04SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2017-05-04SenateRe-referred to Executive
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 072-036-002
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 003-002-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-07HouseAssigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback