IL HJR0034 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Friday, April 19, 2013, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 30, 2013, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 23, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, April 24, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, April 25, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 30, 2013, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0034.htm |