IL HJR0034 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the United States Environmental Protection Agency in its efforts to protect the health of Illinoisans and fulfill the charge of the Clean Air Act to clean up dangerous air pollution, including mercury, lead, soot, smog, and carbon pollution.
Title
SUPPORTS US EPA-CLEAN AIR ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2012-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 24, 2012 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment; 005-003-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Postponed - Environment |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Held in Environment |
2012-02-27 | Senate | Re-assigned to Environment |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg |
2012-01-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-05-31 | House | Resolution Adopted 059-056-000 |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2011-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2011-05-30 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Environmental Health Committee; 016-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed |
2011-05-29 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Environmental Health Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-29 | House | Assigned to Environmental Health Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HJR/09700HJ0034.htm |