IL HJR0034 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
BE IT RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE NINETY-SIXTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that the two Houses shall convene in Joint Session on Wednesday, March 18, 2009 at the hour of 12:00 o'clock noon for the purpose of hearing his Excellency Governor Patrick J. Quinn present to the General Assembly his Report on the Condition of the State of Illinois and to hear the Budget Message for the Fiscal Year 2010, as required by Chapter 15, Section 20/50-5 of the Illinois Compiled Statutes.
Title
STATE OF THE STATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2009-03-18 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) | |
2009-03-18 | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) | |
2009-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-10 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-03-10 | Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=34&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HJR/09600HJ0034.htm |