IL HJR0033 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Congratulates the Chicago Cubs on winning the 2016 World Series.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONGRATS - 2016 CHICAGO CUBS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-05-11HouseHouse Concurs
2017-05-11HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000
2017-04-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-17HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-17HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-04-05HouseArrived in House
2017-04-05SenateResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-14SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-14SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-08HouseResolution Adopted
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-23HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-02-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-22HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback