IL HJR0032 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Army and the President to grant 1st Lieutenant Clint Lorance clemency in his case or, in the alternative, a new trial.
Title
URGE FEDS-LT. LORANCE CLEMENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Tabled |
2015-03-12 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-03-10 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=32&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0032.htm |