IL HJR0030 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May of 2023 as "BPD Month".
Title
BPD MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-05-11 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 020-000-000 |
2023-05-02 | House | Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=30&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0030.htm |