IL HJR0029 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, February 16, 2017, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 22, 2017 at 12:00 o'clock noon, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 23, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, February 24, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until March 7, 2017 at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, February 16, 2017, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 28, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, March 1, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, March 2, 2017, and when it adjourns on that day it stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 7, 2017, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseAdopted Both Houses
2017-02-16SenateResolution Adopted
2017-02-16SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2017-02-16SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Antonio Muñoz; 3-6(a)
2017-02-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-02-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-16HouseResolution Adopted
2017-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback