IL HJR0026 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Illinois Department of Public Health to promulgate administrative rules pursuant to the requirement for health examinations and immunizations within the School Code and to expedite this process in order to have such rules in place for the 2015-16 school year.
Title
VACCINATION RULES -DPH
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-03-04 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2015-02-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2015-02-09 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=26&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HJR/09900HJ0026.htm |