IL HJR0025 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Legislative Blockchain and Distributed Ledger Task Force to study how and if the State of Illinois, county governments, and municipal governments can benefit from a transition to a blockchain based system for recordkeeping and service delivery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLOCKCHAIN TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateResolution Adopted as Amended 046-000-000
2017-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateBe Adopted as Amended Government Reform; 006-000-000
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Government Reform
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-21HouseResolution Adopted as Amended 110-000-000
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-03-16HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-09HouseRe-assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback