IL HJR0023 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Senate and the Illinois House of Representatives to create a joint legislative cancer caucus, to be known as the Illinois Legislative Cancer Caucus, to provide a forum for discussing and evaluating public policies affecting cancer research, treatment, education, and prevention efforts.
Title
URGE CREATION OF CANCER CAUCUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-05-23 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=23&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0023.htm |