IL HJR0021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the overpass at 200 North Road crossing I-57 South of Paxton as the "McCarter-Caisse-Vice-Hale Memorial Overpass".
Title
PAXTON MEM OVERPASS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-28 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-03-07 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |