IL HJR0021 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Stuttle Road overpass over Interstate 55 in Williamsville as the "Trooper Bernard D. Skeeters Memorial Overpass".
Title
TROOPER SKEETERS MEM OVERPASS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Be Adopted Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Resolution Adopted 110-000-000 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000 |
2015-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-02-27 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-02-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rich Brauer |