IL HJR0006 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the creation via legislation of the Illinois Commission on Fiscal Responsibility and Reform, whose purpose shall be to examine the extent to which current practices of the executive agencies either conform to or fall short of established laws, regulations and best practices, and to determine the fiscal impact which the State realizes as a result of falling short of compliance with such practices.
Title
COMMISSION ON FISCAL REFORM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2019-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2019-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HJR/10100HJ0006.htm |