IL HJR0006 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDREDTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, January 12, 2017, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 17, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Friday, January 20, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 24, 2017, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Wednesday, January 18, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Monday, January 23, 2017, in perfunctory session; and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, January 24, 2017, or until the call of the President.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.; 3-6(a) |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-01-12 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HJR/10000HJ0006.htm |