IL HJR0004 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the section of US Route 45, Iroquois County Road 2400 North on the South, to Illinois State Route 116 on the North as the "Firefighter Dana Schoolman Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREFIGHTER SCHOOLMAN MEM HWY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-28SenateArrive in Senate
2017-02-09HouseResolution Adopted 113-000-000
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-08HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback