IL HB6901 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act, Counties Code, and Illinois Municipal Code. Authorizes any State Police officer, sheriff, deputy sheriff, or municipal peace officer who is on duty disability to carry a concealed weapon. Authorizes the summary revocation or suspension of such an authorization. Provides that neither a revocation or suspension of authorization to carry a concealed weapon nor the failure to revoke or suspend such an authorization may be used to determine whether an officer is fit for duty or to establish the liability of the Department of State Police, a county, or a municipality for the actions of a duty disabled officer. Provides that neither the ability of a duty disabled officer to meet the minimum mandatory annual active duty and retired officer handgun qualification course of fire requirements nor any other demonstration of ability or fitness required under these provisions may be used to assess whether that officer is qualified for active duty. Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Defines "duty disabled Department of State Police Officer", "duty disabled sheriff", "duty disabled deputy sheriff", and "duty disable municipal peace officer". Effective immediately.
Title
DISABLED OFFICERS-WEAPONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-10 | First Reading | |
2010-09-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2010-09-02 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2010-08-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6901&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB6901.htm |