IL HB6630 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2016 levy year, the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law applies to all taxing districts, including home rule units. Provides that, beginning with the 2016 levy year, the extension limitation under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law is 0% or the rate of increase approved by the voters. Preempts home rule. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-PTELL
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] |
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading January 10, 2017 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-01-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-01-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas Sauer |
2017-01-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-024-006 |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2017-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-01-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-01-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-01-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-001-001 |
2017-01-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-30 | House | First Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-242 | New Code | See Bill Text |