IL HB6311 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that each tax purchaser shall pay to the county collector an automation fee set by the county board of not more than $10 for each item purchased (currently, each county collector may assess such a fee). Provides that the indemnity fee in counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants shall be not more than $20 (currently, the fee is $20). Makes changes concerning the fee imposed by the county board on each person purchasing property at a sale under the Code for payment of interest and costs.
Title
PROP TX-TAX PURCHASERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-05-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-03-29 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 21-330 | Amended Code | Citation Text |