IL HB6232 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide that beginning on or before January 1, 2016, the Secretary of State must inquire as to whether an applicant for a State identification card or driver's license is a holder of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card for purposes of issuing an identification card or driver's license with a FOID designation. Provides that an identification card or driver's license with a FOID designation shall also display the applicant's Firearm Owner's Identification Card number and expiration date. Provides that the Secretary shall notify the Department of State Police whenever an identification card or driver's license is issued with a FOID designation. Provides that if the Secretary receives notice from the Department of State Police that the holder of an identification card or driver's license with a FOID designation is no longer eligible to hold a Firearm Owner's Identification Card, the Secretary shall confiscate the identification card or driver's license containing the FOID designation and issue a new identification card or driver's license without the FOID designation. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a Firearm Owner's Identification Card holder who has been issued an identification card or driver's license containing a FOID designation may present the identification card or driver's license containing the FOID designation instead of the Firearm Owner's Identification Card whenever the display of a Firearm Owner's Identification Card is required under the Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall notify the Secretary of State if a Firearm Owner's Identification Card holder who has been issued an identification card or driver's license containing the FOID designation becomes ineligible to hold a Firearm Owner's Identification Card.
Title
FOID STATUS ON STATE ID CARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2012-10-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard Morthland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 65 | 6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6232&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6232.htm |