IL HB6211 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that each person applying at a driver services facility for a driver's license or permit, a corrected driver's license or permit, an Illinois identification card or a corrected Illinois identification card shall be notified that the person shall be registered (rather than may apply to register) to vote, and if his or her address has changed, his or her voter registration information shall be updated (rather than may be transferred upon application) to the new address within this State. Provides that the person may decline to register to vote and the employee or the Secretary of State shall not transmit the person's information to the applicable election authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-VOTER REGISTRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-22HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2016-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2016-04-12HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2016-04-08HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
2016-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2016-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2016-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2016-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2016-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2016-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2016-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2016-03-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2016-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2016-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2016-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2016-02-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62552-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback