IL HB6202 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois False Claims Act. Provides that no court has jurisdiction over a civil action relating to or involving a false claim regarding a tax Act administered by the Department unless the action is brought by the Attorney General at the request of the Department. Provides that: the Department has the sole authority to initiate an administrative or judicial action resulting from information provided by a person alleging a false claim, statement, or record pertaining to a tax Act administered by the Department; the Department shall establish a procedure for the reporting of those allegations; the Department shall diligently investigate allegations of a false claim, statement, or record and may bring an action for all applicable taxes, penalties, and interest due under the tax Act; if the Department proceeds with an administrative or judicial action based on information brought to its attention by a private person, that person shall receive an award, subject to specified limits, from the action or from a settlement in response to that action, taking into account the significance of the person's information and the role of the person and a legal representative of the person in contributing to the action; an award may not be issued if the information resulting in the initiation of the action was originally provided by the person alleging the false claim; if the Department determines that the claim for award is brought by a person who planned and initiated the actions that led to the false claim and a resulting underpayment of tax for the purpose of bringing an action, the Department may appropriately reduce the award; and a determination of the Department regarding an award may be appealed to the Court of Claims within 30 days of the determination.
Title
FALSE CLAIMS ACT-DEPT REVENUE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-08-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-08-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2012-07-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-07-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-07-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 175 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 175 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6202&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6202.htm |