IL HB6193 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-13-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code and the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. With respect to the renewal of a Standard Teaching Certificate, provides that continuing professional development activities may include participating in or presenting at in-service training programs on sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention. Provides that the Comprehensive Health Education Program shall include age-appropriate sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention education in grades pre-kindergarten through 12 (instead of sexual assault awareness in secondary schools). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUC-SEXUAL ABUSE/ASSAULT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-24HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1147
2013-01-24HouseEffective Date January 24, 2013
2013-01-24HouseGovernor Approved
2013-01-08HouseSent to the Governor
2013-01-03HousePassed Both Houses
2013-01-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2013-01-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013
2013-01-02SenateSecond Reading
2013-01-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 2, 2013
2013-01-02SenateDo Pass Executive; 013-000-000
2013-01-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
2013-01-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner
2013-01-02SenateWaive Posting Notice
2013-01-02SenateAssigned to Executive
2012-12-06SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Tim Bivins
2012-12-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-12-05SenateFirst Reading
2012-12-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2012-12-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2012-12-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2012-12-05SenateArrive in Senate
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dena M. Carli
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
2012-12-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-010-003
2012-12-05House3/5 Vote Required
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cory Foster
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth
2012-12-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2012-12-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-12-04HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-000-000
2012-12-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2012-11-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2012-11-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2013
2012-11-26HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-06-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-06-27HouseFirst Reading
2012-06-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051103Amended CodeCitation Text
105521-14Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback