IL HB6185 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Central Management Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the appeal of a decision by the Workers' Compensation Commission on compensability of a State employee's claim for workers' compensation benefits may be made to the circuit court.
Title
CMS-WORKERS COMPENSATION
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2012-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-05-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-05-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 405 | 405-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 405 | 64.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6185&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB6185.htm |