IL HB6155 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the ordinary and contingent expenses of the Office of the Lieutenant Governor for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2014, as follows: General Funds $1,186,600; Other State Funds $47,500; Total $1,234,100.
Title
$LT GOV FY15 OCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-06-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2014-04-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6155&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/PDF/09800HB6155.pdf |