IL HB6135 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-09 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Sexual Assault Investigation Act. Provides that allegations of sexual assault of an officer while performing his or her duties shall immediately be reported to the police officer's supervisory or command personnel and an independent law enforcement agency. Provides that the independent law enforcement agency shall conduct a formal investigation of the allegations and provide written findings and recommendations to the State's Attorney and police officer's supervisory or command personnel which may be the basis for filing charges seeking the police officer's removal, discharge, or suspension. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall adopt written protocols and guidelines for the investigation of law enforcement officers accused of sexual assault.
Title
INVESTIGATIONS OF POLICE
Sponsors
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2017-01-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-01-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-01-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6135&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6135.htm |