IL HB6135 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $10,000,000 from the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Fund to the Supreme Court Historic Preservation Commission for historic preservation purposes. Effective July 1, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$SUP CT HISTORIC PRESERV COMM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-07-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-06HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2012-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2012-03-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback