IL HB6128 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the educator licensure provisions of the School Code. Allows persons who have completed a comparable preparation program in another state to earn a Professional Educator License. Requires that certain required testing under the Code for applicants for a Professional Educator License who are holders of an Educator License with Stipulation includes an evidence-based assessment of teacher effectiveness, approved by the State Superintendent of Education in consultation with the State Educator Preparation and Licensure Board, and requires that testing to be completed by the end of the second year of employment as a teacher of record. Requires applicants for an Educator License with Stipulations to satisfy the requirements for a Professional Educator License.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR PREP
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 003-001-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |