IL HB6112 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that for a laborer, worker, or mechanic engaged in the transportation of aggregate or excavated materials or the operation of equipment to haul aggregate or excavated materials to or from the site of the building or construction job, the Department of Labor shall take into consideration the applicable prevailing wage rate and the Illinois Department of Transportation's current method of establishing equipment rates for trucks on public works projects. Defines various terms.
Title
PREVAILING WAGE-HAUL EXCAVATED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-05-07 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Postponed - Labor | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Postponed - Labor | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-04-19 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-04-15 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine | |
2010-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Labor | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-043-000 | |
2010-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-11 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2010-03-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2010-03-11 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-10 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2010-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2010-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-03-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-03-09 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-09 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 015-007-000 | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2010-02-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2010-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano | |
2010-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider |