IL HB6109 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Supreme Court Act. Provides that the Supreme Court may establish a pilot program for the filing of petitions for temporary orders of protection by electronic means and for the issuance of such orders by audio-visual means. Provides that the administrative director of the courts shall maintain an up-to-date and publicly available listing of the sites, if any, at which petitions for ex parte temporary orders of protection may be filed, and at which electronic appearances in support of such petitions may be made. Provides that in developing a pilot program, the administrative director shall strive for a program that is regionally diverse and takes into consideration, among other things, the availability of public transportation, population density, and the availability of facilities for conducting the program. Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Defines terms and provides substantive and procedural requirements for the pilot program.
Title
ORDERS OF PROTECTION: E-FILING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0718 |
2016-08-05 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-001 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 5 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
750 | 60 | 202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |