IL HB6093 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides a definition for "automobile transporter" and "backhaul". Amends the definition for "stinger-steered semitrailer" and "truck tractor". Provides that the length of a stinger-steered semitrailer specifically designed to transport motor vehicles or an automobile transporter cannot exceed 80 feet (rather than 75 feet), with an overhang of less than 4 feet (rather than 3 feet) and a rear overhang of less than 6 feet (rather than 4 feet). Provides an automobile transporter of these lengths can also be used when transporting other cargo or general freight on a backhaul. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-AUTO TRANSPORTER-LENGTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0717 |
2016-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2016 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-105.2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-105.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 1-198 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 1-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |