IL HB6054 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that, on April 1 of each year beginning the year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, privately held public water utilities shall provide annual reports to the Illinois Commerce Commission with specified information for each municipality served by the utility. Provides that the utility shall certify the accuracy of the information provided in the reports. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-WATER PRICING REPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | To Special Matters Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6054&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6054.htm |