IL HB5991 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Reitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1158 | |
2010-07-21 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-15 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-15 | First Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz |