IL HB5985 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that ethylene oxide may only be used for the sterilization of medical products. Prohibits the use of ethylene oxide on and after January 1, 2021. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall reevaluate emissions standards and regulations for ethylene oxide and promulgate new emissions standards and regulations. Provides reporting requirements. Provides that the Agency shall conduct an evaluation of ethylene oxide emissions by facilities with a Clean Air Act Permit Program permit and evaluate and modify any such permit as needed. Provides that the Agency shall revoke a facility's CAAPP permit if a significant public health hazard is determined to exist due to ethylene oxide emissions. Provides that a facility permitted to emit ethylene oxide shall halt emissions of ethylene oxide for a specific amount of time. Provides that it is a violation to emit ethylene oxide at a level that violates any federal or State emissions standards or regulations and the Agency shall not renew the permit of any facility in violation. Provides a right of action for any person exposed to ethylene oxide. Provides notice requirements regarding ethylene oxide. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-ETHYLENE OXIDE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-11-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-11-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-000-000 |
2018-11-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-11-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5985&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5985.htm |