IL HB5975 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-09 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Repeals the increase in the limiting rate under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law for Berwyn South School District Number 100 adopted by referendum at the election held on April 4, 2017, effective levy year 2018. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BERWYN-PROP TX-REPEAL INCREASE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-11-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-10-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-205Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback