IL HB5971 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on December 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Designates the month of April of each year as Arab American Heritage Month to be observed throughout the State as a month to recognize the valuable contributions of Arab Americans to this State and to the various aspects of American society. Effective immediately.
Title
ARAB AMERICAN HERITAGE MONTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1150 |
2018-12-14 | House | Effective Date December 14, 2018 |
2018-12-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-12-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-11-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000 |
2018-11-15 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-11-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-11-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-10-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |