IL HB5937 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-08-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-08-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5937&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5937.htm |