IL HB5930 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish, by rule, minimum quality standards for providers of medical supplies, equipment, and related services applicable to contracted managed care organizations for all services rendered to MCO enrollees. Requires the minimum quality standards to be based upon recognized national standards promulgated by national bodies and by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services. Requires the Department to set a rate of reimbursement payable by contracted managed care organizations to contracted, in-network providers of medical supplies, equipment, and related services at the default rate of reimbursement paid under the Illinois Medicaid fee-for-service program methodology for such medical supplies, equipment, and related services in effect as of June 30, 2017. Requires contracted managed care organizations to offer a reimbursement rate to contracted, in-network providers of medical supplies, equipment, and related services at not less than 90% of the default rate of reimbursement paid under the Illinois Medicaid fee-for-service program methodology, including all policy adjusters, for such medical supplies, equipment, and related services of similar quality. Provides that these provisions shall not be construed to allow the Department or its contracted MCOs to enter into sole source contracts for the provision of durable medical equipment, supplies, or related services to Medicaid beneficiaries and Medicaid managed care enrollees. Effective immediately.
Title
DURABLE MEDICAL SUPPLIES-RATES
Sponsors
Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-08-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-08-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-07-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-07-26 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-07-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-07-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-07-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-07-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5930&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5930.htm |