IL HB5901 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0590
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, before the 30th day of each school year, beginning with the 2016-2017 school year, the principal of each public school shall report to the State Board of Education certain information concerning the administration of assessments to students. Requires the State Board of Education to compile the reported information and make that information available to the public. Requires each school to make that information publicly available to the parents and guardians of its students. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
SCH CD-ASSESSMENT REPORTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0590 |
2016-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2016 |
2016-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-004-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-002-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-041-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-006-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |