IL HB5846 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Provides that whenever a State or local law enforcement agency becomes aware that an inhabitable property has been contaminated by its use as a clandestine methamphetamine drug lab, the agency shall report the contamination to the Department of State Police and to the local public health officer. Provides that the Department of State Police shall maintain a list of inhabitable property that has been reported as contaminated, and the list must be made available to the public through a website. Provides that the property shall be removed from the list when the contamination has been removed. Provides that once an inhabitable property has been removed from the list, a property owner, landlord, or real estate agent is not required to report or otherwise disclose the past contamination.
Title
METH CONTROL-METH LAB
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] |
Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5846&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5846.htm |