IL HB0583 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Meat Act. Restores language that exempted certain types of horse meat from regulation under the Act. Repeals a provision that prohibits the slaughter of horses for human consumption. Amends the Animals Intended for Food Act. Expands the definition of "animal" to include "horses, mules, or other equidae". Amends the Illinois Equine Infectious Anemia Control Act. Allows equidae more than 12 months of age to enter the State for immediate slaughter without a certificate of veterinary inspection. Requires equidae entering the State for immediate slaughter to be accompanied by a consignment direct to slaughter at an approved equine slaughtering establishment. Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Creates an exemption from the general prohibition against selling, offering to sell, leading, riding, transporting, or driving on any public way any equidae that, because of debility, disease, lameness or any other cause, could not be worked in this State. Deletes a provision that prohibited injured equidae from being sent directly to a slaughter facility. Amends the Humane Slaughter of Livestock Act. Deletes a provision in the definition of the term "livestock" that excludes "horses, mules, or other equidae to be used in and for the preparation of meat or meat products for consumption by human beings". Imposes conditions on any rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS--HORSE MEAT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-03 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2009-04-01 House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2009-04-01 Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2009-04-01 Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
2009-03-31 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-31 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-31 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-31 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-31 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-27 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-26 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2009-03-25 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-25 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
2009-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
2009-03-25 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John A. Fritchey
2009-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Shane Cultra
2009-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
2009-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
2009-03-17 Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-17 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
2009-03-17 Second Reading - Short Debate
2009-03-17 Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2009-03-17 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2009-03-17 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
2009-03-17 Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
2009-03-11 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2009-03-10 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000
2009-03-10 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2009-03-05 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-03-05 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
2009-03-05 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
2009-03-05 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2009-03-05 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
2009-03-05 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
2009-03-05 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
2009-03-05 Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2009-02-25 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2009-02-24 Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000
2009-02-11 Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2009-02-06 Referred to Rules Committee
2009-02-06 First Reading
2009-02-05 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback