IL HB5828 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $5,797,550 from the Build Illinois Bond Fund to the Capital Development Board for early childhood construction grants. Appropriates $1,375,000 from the Build Illinois Bond Fund to the Capital Development Board for a grant to Gads Hill Center for an early childhood center located in Brighton Park and other capital improvements. Effective immediately.
Title
$CDB-EARLY CHILDHOOD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-001-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5828&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB5828.pdf |