IL HB5828 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. In a provision concerning rural ambulance service upgrades, provides that notwithstanding the service level of an ambulance, a first responder licensed by the Department of Public Health is authorized to function as a first responder.
Title
RURAL AMBUL-FIRST RESPONDERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0881 |
2014-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2014 |
2014-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2014-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2014-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |