IL HB5825 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code to provide that, except for those children qualifying under the Article of the Code concerning children with disabilities, school districts shall be eligible to receive reimbursement for all children requiring home or hospital instruction at not more than $1,000 annually per child or $9,000 (instead of $8,000) per teacher, whichever is less.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-HOME HOSPITAL GRANTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-25HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1156
2013-01-25HouseEffective Date January 25, 2013
2013-01-25HouseGovernor Approved
2012-12-06HouseSent to the Governor
2012-11-28HousePassed Both Houses
2012-11-28HouseHouse Concurs 114-000-000
2012-11-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
2012-11-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
2012-11-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-11-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-11-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2012-11-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-001-000
2012-07-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2012-07-27HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2012-07-27HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-05-28HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2012-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2012-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2012-05-23HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2012-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2012-05-22HouseArrived in House
2012-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-002-000
2012-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2012
2012-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2012-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2012
2012-05-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 008-000-000
2012-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2012-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2012-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2012-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2012-05-08SenatePostponed - Education
2012-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012
2012-05-01SenateHeld in Education
2012-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2012-05-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2012-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2012-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2012-04-24SenateAssigned to Education
2012-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2012-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2012-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2012
2012-03-29SenateArrive in Senate
2012-03-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2012-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 023-000-000
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2012-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105518-4.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5825&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5825.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5825eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5825sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5825sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5825enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/97/097-1156.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5825_03282012_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/senate/09700HB5825_05222012_065000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5825_11282012_009001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5825_11282012_009000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback