IL HB5821 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $7,940,486 from the Illinois Habitat Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the preservation and maintenance of high quality habitat lands in accordance with the provisions of the Habitat Endowment Act. Appropriates $2,718,401 from the Illinois Habitat Fund to the Department of Natural Resources for the preservation and maintenance of a high quality fish and wildlife habitat and to promote the heritage of outdoor sports in Illinois from revenue derived from the sale of Sportsmen Series license plates. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
$DNR-HABITAT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5821&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/PDF/10000HB5821.pdf |