IL HB5817 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that when the victim is under 18 years of age at the time of the offense, a prosecution for female genital mutilation may be commenced at any time. Provides that a parent, guardian, or other person having physical custody or control of a child who knowingly facilitates or permits the circumcision, excision, or infibulation, in whole or in part, of the labia majora, labia minora, or clitoris of the child commits female genital mutilation. Provides that a violation is a Class X felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FEMALE GEN MUTILATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-34Amended CodeCitation Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback