IL HB5812 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium and Common Interest Community Ombudsperson Act. Makes numerous technical and substantive changes in provisions concerning: definitions; the Office of the Condominium and Common Interest Community Ombudsperson; the Office's website; the written policy for receiving complaints; requests for assistance; dispute resolution; confidentiality; and reporting requirements. Repeals a Section concerning registration. Effective July 1, 2016.
Title
CONDO OMBUDSPERSON-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 615 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 615 | 55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5812&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5812.htm |