IL HB5809 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-10-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits criminal sexual assault if that person commits an act of sexual penetration and the victim is at least 18 years of age but under 22 years of age and is a student attending classes at a public or nonpublic secondary school and the accused held or holds a position of trust, authority, or supervision over the victim in connection with an educational or extracurricular program or activity at the time of the commission of the act, regardless of the location or place of the commission of the act. Provides that a person also commits aggravated criminal sexual abuse if that person commits an act of sexual conduct with a victim who is at least 18 years of age but under 22 years of age and is a student attending classes at a public or nonpublic secondary school and the accused held or holds a position of trust, authority, or supervision in relation to the victim in connection with an educational or extracurricular program or activity at the time of the commission of the act, regardless of the location or place of the commission of the act. Provides that, for purposes of the grooming statute, "child" includes a person who is at least 17 years of age but under 22 years of age and is a student attending classes at a public or nonpublic secondary school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-GROOMING&ASSAULT&ABUSE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly
2022-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2022-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2022-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2022-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2022-10-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2022-09-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2022-09-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-1.20Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-1.60Amended CodeCitation Text
720511-25Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-13Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-16Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback